|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2439.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2021
|
June 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|