|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3014.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|