Assembly | 06/29/2021 | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 969.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 669.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |