Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3328.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S., G.O., and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |