Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3879.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3770.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3457.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |