Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3327.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |