Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3928.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3770.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3094.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|