|
09/17/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6007.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3928.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 3184.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|