Senate | 04/05/2022 | April 5 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |