California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022