|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6039.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3981.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3771.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3048.) (March 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Set for hearing March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|