Assembly | 08/31/2022 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 38. Noes 22. Page 5396.) | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3669.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3627.) (May 5). | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |