Senate | 02/24/2022 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, ED., and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |