Senate | 03/09/2022 | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |