|
08/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5712.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|