Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3929.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3773.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3253.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3061.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|