|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 663, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5081.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 6009.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3881.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3773.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|