Senate | 03/28/2022 | March 31 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |