California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022