|
09/06/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5934.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3774.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|