Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3671.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
March 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|