|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 470, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5389.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5514.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3108.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|