Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2022
|
June 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3183.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|