Senate | 04/04/2022 | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |