Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 3463.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |