Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Haney.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|