|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 823, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5307.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 3888.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3775.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3435.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|