Assembly | 06/28/2022 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 3837.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3203.) (March 23). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |