|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 666, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4829.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 5776.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3823.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3254.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|