|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 988, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5023.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5954.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/29/2022
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3184.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|