Senate
|
09/13/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5393.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 6024.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3836.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3776.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3203.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|