California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB945 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022