California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB955 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022