California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022