Assembly | 06/09/2022 | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3513.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |