|
08/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5821.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3931.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3777.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3273.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|