California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB97 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021