Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3978.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3778.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3307.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|