Senate | 04/20/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, PUB. S., and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |