|
06/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 5553.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 46 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5503.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4278.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
(Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4259.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Senate Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 4206.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4206.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Set for hearing June 16 in APPR pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
Set for hearing June 14 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
Set for hearing June 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|