Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Glazer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2160.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
July 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Set for hearing July 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1691.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2021
|
Set for hearing June 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1465.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|