03/19/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2021. | |||
03/19/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 580.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 203.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |