06/24/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/24/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/20/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3700.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |