09/13/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2022. | |||
09/13/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/31/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2022 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4676.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2022 | Set for hearing August 1. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 4493.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2022 | Set for hearing June 28. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |