08/01/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/01/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/30/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5642.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4169.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |