08/30/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/30/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/22/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5956.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4656.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2022 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2022 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |