|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 4707.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Set for hearing August 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|