|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2283.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 781.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|