1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 16 CHAPTER 20Relative to Women in Construction Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 21, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 16, Caballero. Women in Construction Week.This measure would proclaim the week of March 7, 2021, to March 13, 2021, inclusive, as Women in Construction Week. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 1987, Congress declared March as national Womens History Month in perpetuity, and since then, the industry has celebrated women in construction during the first week of March; and WHEREAS, The focus of Women in Construction Week is to highlight women as a visible component of the construction industry; andWHEREAS, The continuous progress of our economy requires full participation and support of all citizens, regardless of gender, race, or ethnic background; andWHEREAS, The workforce in California is becoming increasingly diversified and for this states construction industry to remain competitive in the global economy, it must also diversify its workforce by attracting significantly more women into the industry; andWHEREAS, Women currently occupy only 10 percent of all apprenticeships and less than 3 percent of construction trade jobs nationally. As a state, we should support policy efforts, such as Chapter 675 of the Statutes of 2018 (Assembly Bill 2358) and Chapter 722 of the Statutes of 2019 (Senate Bill 530). We aim to make construction job sites safer and more welcoming to women and will help achieve at least 20 percent by 2021; andWHEREAS, The construction industry in California has tremendous need for skilled and motivated workers, managers, and entrepreneurs from all segments of the population; andWHEREAS, The construction industry must strive to educate and inspire parents, educators, and career counselors to encourage Californias youth to enter into rewarding career opportunities in construction; andWHEREAS, Rising costs of higher education and evolving employer workforce training needs make apprenticeship an increasingly important career pathway without the burden of student loans; andWHEREAS, Women face many barriers to entering and staying in the construction field and have historically been excluded from apprenticeship opportunities that lead to meaningful careers with family-supporting wages; andWHEREAS, Apprenticeships are a critical pathway for women to participate fully and equally in Californias growing economy; andWHEREAS, The development of women-owned business enterprises will benefit all members of the workforce through the creation of meaningful and productive jobs; andWHEREAS, Research has shown that gender diversity is associated with increased performance, innovation, and opportunity. Having more women entrepreneurs and small business owners operating in the construction industry will only benefit the working conditions for women across all industries; andWHEREAS, Women represent an untapped resource, and activities to improve womens recruitment and retention in skilled construction jobs is critically important in helping to close the workforce skills gap, build the middle class, and help meet the needs of the 21st century; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims March 7, 2021, to March 13, 2021, inclusive, as Women in Construction Week and requests that the Governor issue a proclamation calling on the people of the great State of California to observe the week with appropriate programs and education activities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 06, 2021 Passed IN Senate March 08, 2021 Passed IN Assembly March 25, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 16Introduced by Senator Caballero(Coauthor: Senator Hurtado)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Megan Dahle, Davies, Cristina Garcia, Nguyen, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Waldron, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Flora, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Ramos, Rendon, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Ward, Wicks, and Wood)February 19, 2021Relative to Women in Construction Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 16, Caballero. Women in Construction Week.This measure would proclaim the week of March 7, 2021, to March 13, 2021, inclusive, as Women in Construction Week. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 1987, Congress declared March as national Womens History Month in perpetuity, and since then, the industry has celebrated women in construction during the first week of March; and WHEREAS, The focus of Women in Construction Week is to highlight women as a visible component of the construction industry; andWHEREAS, The continuous progress of our economy requires full participation and support of all citizens, regardless of gender, race, or ethnic background; andWHEREAS, The workforce in California is becoming increasingly diversified and for this states construction industry to remain competitive in the global economy, it must also diversify its workforce by attracting significantly more women into the industry; andWHEREAS, Women currently occupy only 10 percent of all apprenticeships and less than 3 percent of construction trade jobs nationally. As a state, we should support policy efforts, such as Chapter 675 of the Statutes of 2018 (Assembly Bill 2358) and Chapter 722 of the Statutes of 2019 (Senate Bill 530). We aim to make construction job sites safer and more welcoming to women and will help achieve at least 20 percent by 2021; andWHEREAS, The construction industry in California has tremendous need for skilled and motivated workers, managers, and entrepreneurs from all segments of the population; andWHEREAS, The construction industry must strive to educate and inspire parents, educators, and career counselors to encourage Californias youth to enter into rewarding career opportunities in construction; andWHEREAS, Rising costs of higher education and evolving employer workforce training needs make apprenticeship an increasingly important career pathway without the burden of student loans; andWHEREAS, Women face many barriers to entering and staying in the construction field and have historically been excluded from apprenticeship opportunities that lead to meaningful careers with family-supporting wages; andWHEREAS, Apprenticeships are a critical pathway for women to participate fully and equally in Californias growing economy; andWHEREAS, The development of women-owned business enterprises will benefit all members of the workforce through the creation of meaningful and productive jobs; andWHEREAS, Research has shown that gender diversity is associated with increased performance, innovation, and opportunity. Having more women entrepreneurs and small business owners operating in the construction industry will only benefit the working conditions for women across all industries; andWHEREAS, Women represent an untapped resource, and activities to improve womens recruitment and retention in skilled construction jobs is critically important in helping to close the workforce skills gap, build the middle class, and help meet the needs of the 21st century; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims March 7, 2021, to March 13, 2021, inclusive, as Women in Construction Week and requests that the Governor issue a proclamation calling on the people of the great State of California to observe the week with appropriate programs and education activities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|