05/14/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2021. | |||
05/14/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | (Corrected May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 494.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | (Corrected March 9). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |